NJ A3344 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2998
Note: Carry Foward to future S1533
Note: Carry Over of previous A2172
Note: Carry Foward to future S1533
Note: Carry Over of previous A2172
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-07 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-07 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts certain plenary winery licensees from filing requirements imposed on retail sellers of litter-generating products.
Title
Exempts certain plenary winery licensees from filing requirements imposed on retail sellers of litter-generating products.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-03 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-07 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-02-12 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3344 (Carry Over) 2018-05-07 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
A3344 (Carry Over) 2018-05-07 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
A2172 (Carry Over) 2017-06-22 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
S2139 (Same As) 2018-03-05 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
A3344 (Carry Over) 2018-05-07 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
A2172 (Carry Over) 2017-06-22 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
S2139 (Same As) 2018-03-05 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee