NJ A3390 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on October 15 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-06 - Substituted by S2318
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 15 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-06 - Substituted by S2318
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires newborn infant screening for tongue tie.
Title
Requires newborn infant screening for tongue tie.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-06 | Assembly | Substituted by S2318 |
2013-12-12 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2012-10-15 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2318 (Same As) 2014-01-21 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2012/A3390 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2012/A3500/3390_I1.HTM |