NJ A3390 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on January 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-01-11 - Approved P.L.2015, c.207.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on January 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-01-11 - Approved P.L.2015, c.207.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Permits transmittal of certain land use documents via email.
Title
Permits transmittal of certain land use documents via email.
Sponsors
Rep. Craig Coughlin [D] | Rep. Nancy Pinkin [D] | Rep. Jay Webber [R] | Sen. Patrick Diegnan [D] |
Sen. Joseph Vitale [D] | Rep. Timothy Eustace [D] | Rep. Nancy Munoz [R] | Rep. Gary Schaer [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S2309 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-10 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-13 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-10 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-13 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-11 | Senate | Approved P.L.2015, c.207. |
2015-12-17 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (40-0) |
2015-12-17 | Senate | Substituted for S2309 (1R) |
2015-12-10 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2014-12-01 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
2014-11-13 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (73-0-0) |
2014-09-22 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2014-06-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2309 (Same As) 2015-12-17 - Substituted by A3390 (1R)