NJ A3390 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S3616
Note: Carry Over of previous A4248
Note: Carry Over of previous A4248
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes rebuttable presumption that person charged with motor vehicle theft be detained prior to trial; imposes mandatory sentencing for thefts involving motor vehicle.
Title
Establishes rebuttable presumption that person charged with motor vehicle theft be detained prior to trial; imposes mandatory sentencing for thefts involving motor vehicle.
Sponsors
Rep. Jay Webber [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-01 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1367 (Same As) 2024-01-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
S3616 (Carry Over) 2023-02-23 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
A4248 (Carry Over) 2022-06-13 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
S3616 (Carry Over) 2023-02-23 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
A4248 (Carry Over) 2022-06-13 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2024/A3390 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2024/A3500/3390_I1.HTM |