NJ A3397 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on June 12 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-01-29 - Substituted by S2234
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 12 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-01-29 - Substituted by S2234
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Abolishes Landscape Irrigation Contractors Examining Board in the Department of Environmental Protection and transfers regulation of landscape irrigation contractors to Department of Community Affairs.
Title
Abolishes Landscape Irrigation Contractors Examining Board in the Department of Environmental Protection and transfers regulation of landscape irrigation contractors to Department of Community Affairs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-10-23 - Assembly - Assembly Regulated Professions Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-29 | Assembly | Substituted by S2234 |
2014-10-23 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2014-06-12 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Regulated Professions Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2234 (Same As) 2015-12-09 - Approved P.L.2015, c.169.