NJ A3415 | 2010-2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Enrolled on December 20 2010 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - 2nd Reading in the Assembly on Concur. w/Gov.'s Recommend.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on December 20 2010 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - 2nd Reading in the Assembly on Concur. w/Gov.'s Recommend.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires, after study, DEP to adopt total maximum daily loads for Barnegat Bay ecosystem, and requires DEP to adopt nutrient standards for NJ marine waters.*
Title
Requires, after study, DEP to adopt total maximum daily loads for Barnegat Bay ecosystem, and requires DEP to adopt nutrient standards for NJ marine waters.*
Sponsors
Sen. Peter Barnes [D] | Sen. Christopher Bateman [R] | Sen. Robert Gordon [D] | Rep. Valerie Huttle [D] |
Rep. Mila Jasey [D] | Sen. John McKeon [D] | Sen. Robert Smith [D] | Rep. David Wolfe [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-12-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-12-13 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-12-13 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-01 | 2nd Reading in the Assembly on Concur. w/Gov.'s Recommend. | |
2011-12-01 | First Reading/Governor Recommendations Only | |
2011-02-03 | Conditional Veto, Received in the Assembly | |
2010-12-20 | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (38-0) | |
2010-12-20 | Substituted for S2341 (1R) | |
2010-12-13 | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading | |
2010-12-13 | Passed by the Assembly (75-0-0) | |
2010-12-09 | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading | |
2010-10-18 | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2341 (Same As) 2010-12-20 - Substituted by A3415 (1R)