NJ A3417 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-10-29 - Substituted by S393/973 (SCS)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-10-29 - Substituted by S393/973 (SCS)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes Talent Network Program in DOLWD.
Title
Establishes Talent Network Program in DOLWD.
Sponsors
Rep. Wayne DeAngelo [D] | Rep. Carol Murphy [D] | Rep. Anthony Verrelli [D] | Rep. Herbert Conaway [D] |
Rep. Verlina Reynolds-Jackson [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-10-22 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-10-29 | Assembly | Substituted by S393/973 (SCS) |
2018-10-22 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2018-02-15 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S973 (Same As) 2018-03-05 - Combined with S393 (SCS)
S393 (Same As) 2019-06-17 - Approved P.L.2019, c.125.
S393 (Same As) 2019-06-17 - Approved P.L.2019, c.125.