NJ A345 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A3183
Note: Carry Foward to future S836
Note: Carry Over of previous A3481
Note: Carry Over of previous S724
Note: Carry Foward to future S836
Note: Carry Over of previous A3481
Note: Carry Over of previous S724
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes municipality to deliver property tax bills, construction permits, and receipts for payment via e-mail.
Title
Authorizes municipality to deliver property tax bills, construction permits, and receipts for payment via e-mail.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-11 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A345 (Carry Over) 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
A345 (Carry Over) 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
A3481 (Carry Over) 2020-02-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
S724 (Carry Over) 2021-02-09 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S1785 (Same As) 2022-02-28 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
A345 (Carry Over) 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
A3481 (Carry Over) 2020-02-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
S724 (Carry Over) 2021-02-09 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S1785 (Same As) 2022-02-28 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2022/A345 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2022/A0500/345_I1.HTM |