NJ A3473 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S2940
Note: Carry Over of previous A4765
Note: Carry Over of previous A4765
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-08 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-08 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies spitting in law enforcement officer's food or drink constitutes aggravated assault; requires certain sanctions on restaurant employees who commit this crime.
Title
Clarifies spitting in law enforcement officer's food or drink constitutes aggravated assault; requires certain sanctions on restaurant employees who commit this crime.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-08 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1364 (Same As) 2022-02-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
S2940 (Carry Over) 2020-09-21 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
A4765 (Carry Over) 2020-10-08 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
S2940 (Carry Over) 2020-09-21 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
A4765 (Carry Over) 2020-10-08 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2022/A3473 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2022/A3500/3473_I1.HTM |