NJ A3480 | 2010-2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-2)
Status: Introduced on November 15 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 15 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
"Revised State Medical Examiner Act"; establishes Office of the Chief State Medical Examiner in DHSS.
Title
"Revised State Medical Examiner Act"; establishes Office of the Chief State Medical Examiner in DHSS.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-01 | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading | |
2011-05-05 | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee | |
2010-11-15 | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2395 (Same As) 2011-12-15 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2010/A3480 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2010/A3500/3480_I1.HTM |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2010/A3500/3480_R1.HTM |