NJ A3486 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-30 - Approved P.L.2014, c.13.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-30 - Approved P.L.2014, c.13.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Adjusts and clarifies certain State tax compliance standards and restricts certain State tax benefits.
Title
Adjusts and clarifies certain State tax compliance standards and restricts certain State tax benefits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Table Motion (Y: 48 N: 31 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 35 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S2268 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 25 N: 12 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 25 N: 12 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S2268 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 35 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Assembly - Assembly Table Motion (Y: 48 N: 31 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Budget Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 35 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S2268 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 25 N: 12 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 25 N: 12 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S2268 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 35 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Assembly - Assembly Table Motion (Y: 48 N: 31 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Budget Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-30 | Senate | Approved P.L.2014, c.13. |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (25-12) |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Substituted for S2268 |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2014-06-26 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (42-35-2) |
2014-06-26 | Assembly | Motion To Table (Greenwald) (48-31-0) |
2014-06-26 | Assembly | Motion To Aa (Bucco) |
2014-06-23 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2014-06-23 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Budget Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2268 (Same As) 2014-06-26 - Substituted by A3486