NJ A3487 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A725
Note: Carry Foward to future S983
Note: Carry Over of previous A3390
Note: Carry Over of previous S1475
Note: Carry Foward to future S983
Note: Carry Over of previous A3390
Note: Carry Over of previous S1475
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
Pending: Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
Pending: Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows persons diagnosed with autism to voluntarily enter medical information in MVC database and make notation on driver's licenses, permits, and non-driver identification cards.
Title
Allows persons diagnosed with autism to voluntarily enter medical information in MVC database and make notation on driver's licenses, permits, and non-driver identification cards.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-25 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3487 (Carry Over) 2020-02-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
A3487 (Carry Over) 2020-02-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
S1699 (Same As) 2020-02-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee
A3390 (Carry Over) 2018-02-15 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
S1475 (Carry Over) 2018-02-01 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee
A3487 (Carry Over) 2020-02-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
S1699 (Same As) 2020-02-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee
A3390 (Carry Over) 2018-02-15 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
S1475 (Carry Over) 2018-02-01 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/A3487 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/A3500/3487_I1.HTM |