NJ A3489 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on January 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-01-17 - Approved P.L.2013, c.266.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on January 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-01-17 - Approved P.L.2013, c.266.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows monies statutorily dedicated to standardbred or thoroughbred horse racing purses to be used for benefit of horse racing industry, subject to agreement between permitholder and representative horsemen's organization.*
Title
Allows monies statutorily dedicated to standardbred or thoroughbred horse racing purses to be used for benefit of horse racing industry, subject to agreement between permitholder and representative horsemen's organization.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-01-13 - Senate - Senate Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-13 - Senate - Senate Enact Emergency Clause (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-20 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S2540 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-28 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-13 - Senate - Senate Enact Emergency Clause (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-20 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S2540 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-28 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-17 | Senate | Approved P.L.2013, c.266. |
2014-01-13 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (37-0) |
2014-01-13 | Senate | Emergency Resolution (39-0) (Gordon) |
2014-01-13 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading - Concur. w/Gov's Recom. |
2014-01-13 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (80-0-0) |
2013-09-09 | Assembly | 2nd Reading in the Assembly on Concur. w/Gov.'s Recommend. |
2013-09-09 | Assembly | Cond. Veto Rec'd Assembly, 1st Reading/Governor Recommend. |
2013-06-24 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (78-0-0) |
2013-06-20 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2013-06-20 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (39-0) |
2013-06-20 | Senate | Substituted for S2540 (1R) |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
2013-01-28 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (74-0-0) |
2013-01-14 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2012-12-03 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Regulatory Oversight and Gaming Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2540 (Same As) 2013-06-20 - Substituted by A3489 (1R)