NJ A3499 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-12 - Substituted by S1893 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-12 - Substituted by S1893 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes municipality, county or school district to establish charitable funds for specific purposes; permits property tax credit for certain donations.
Title
Authorizes municipality, county or school district to establish charitable funds for specific purposes; permits property tax credit for certain donations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-05 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-12 | Assembly | Substituted by S1893 (1R) |
2018-04-05 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-04-05 | Assembly | Recommitted to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2018-03-12 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-03-05 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1893 (Same As) 2018-05-04 - Approved P.L.2018, c.11.