NJ A3505 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S830
Note: Carry Over of previous S4106
Note: Carry Over of previous S4106
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-09-22 - Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-09-22 - Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes Chief Administrator of MVC to waive fee for non-driver identification card if applicant submits proof of enrollment in public assistance or social service program.
Title
Authorizes Chief Administrator of MVC to waive fee for non-driver identification card if applicant submits proof of enrollment in public assistance or social service program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-09-22 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-22 | Assembly | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2022-03-08 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3505 (Carry Over) 2022-09-22 - Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
S1778 (Same As) 2022-02-28 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee
S4106 (Carry Over) 2021-11-12 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee
S1778 (Same As) 2022-02-28 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee
S4106 (Carry Over) 2021-11-12 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee