NJ A3506 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S2706
Note: Carry Over of previous A3980
Note: Carry Over of previous A3980
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-05 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Children, Families and Food Security Committee
Pending: Assembly Children, Families and Food Security Committee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-05 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Children, Families and Food Security Committee
Pending: Assembly Children, Families and Food Security Committee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Grants child placed in resource family care and resource family parents the right to be notified when case manager or supervisor is assigned to child; grants child in resource family care right to be notified of certain property and benefits.
Title
Grants child placed in resource family care and resource family parents the right to be notified when case manager or supervisor is assigned to child; grants child in resource family care right to be notified of certain property and benefits.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-05 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Children, Families and Food Security Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1600 (Same As) 2024-01-09 - Withdrawn Because Approved P.L.2023, c.304.
S2706 (Carry Over) 2024-01-08 - Substituted by A3980 (2R)
A3980 (Carry Over) 2024-01-16 - Approved P.L.2023, c.304.
S2706 (Carry Over) 2024-01-08 - Substituted by A3980 (2R)
A3980 (Carry Over) 2024-01-16 - Approved P.L.2023, c.304.
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2024/A3506 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2024/A4000/3506_I1.HTM |