NJ A3518 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S710
Note: Carry Over of previous A3046
Note: Carry Over of previous A3046
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee
Pending: Assembly Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee
Pending: Assembly Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the "Healthy Workplace Act."
Title
Establishes the "Healthy Workplace Act."
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-25 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S633 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee
S710 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee
A3046 (Carry Over) 2018-02-08 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee
S710 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee
A3046 (Carry Over) 2018-02-08 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/A3518 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/A4000/3518_I1.HTM |