NJ A3566 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S3961
Note: Carry Over of previous A5539
Note: Carry Over of previous A5539
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-08 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Oversight, Reform and Federal Relations Committee
Pending: Assembly Oversight, Reform and Federal Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-08 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Oversight, Reform and Federal Relations Committee
Pending: Assembly Oversight, Reform and Federal Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes Division on Marijuana and Cannabis Enforcement in DLPS.
Title
Establishes Division on Marijuana and Cannabis Enforcement in DLPS.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-08 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Oversight, Reform and Federal Relations Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2066 (Same As) 2024-01-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
S3961 (Carry Over) 2023-06-15 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
A5539 (Carry Over) 2023-06-05 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
S3961 (Carry Over) 2023-06-15 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
A5539 (Carry Over) 2023-06-05 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2024/A3566 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2024/A4000/3566_I1.HTM |