NJ A359 | 2010-2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-1)
Status: Passed on December 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-12-20 - Approved P.L.2011, c146.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-1)
Status: Passed on December 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-12-20 - Approved P.L.2011, c146.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
The "Foreclosure Rescue Fraud Prevention Act."
Title
The "Foreclosure Rescue Fraud Prevention Act."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-12-15 - Senate - Senate Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-12-05 - Assembly - Assembly Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-29 - Assembly - Assembly Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-10-25 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-12-05 - Assembly - Assembly Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-29 - Assembly - Assembly Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-10-25 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-20 | Approved P.L.2011, c146. | |
2011-12-15 | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (37-0) | |
2011-12-08 | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading - Concur. w/Gov's Recom. | |
2011-12-05 | Passed by the Assembly (79-0-0) | |
2011-12-01 | 2nd Reading in the Assembly on Concur. w/Gov.'s Recommend. | |
2011-12-01 | First Reading/Governor Recommendations Only | |
2011-11-10 | Conditional Veto, Received in the Assembly | |
2011-06-29 | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (77-0-0) | |
2011-06-29 | Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence | |
2011-06-29 | Passed by the Senate (39-0) | |
2011-06-29 | Substituted for S1651 (SCS) | |
2011-03-03 | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading | |
2010-11-08 | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee | |
2010-10-25 | Passed by the Assembly (78-0-0) | |
2010-09-30 | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Scalera) | |
2010-03-04 | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading | |
2010-01-12 | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1651 (Same As) 2011-06-29 - Substituted by A359 (2R)