NJ A3593 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S894
Note: Carry Foward to future A4416
Note: Carry Over of previous A2027
Note: Carry Over of previous S277
Note: Carry Foward to future A4416
Note: Carry Over of previous A2027
Note: Carry Over of previous S277
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-6)
Status: Introduced on March 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
Pending: Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
Pending: Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
"Emma's Law"; requires school buses that transport students with special needs to be equipped with certain safety features.
Title
"Emma's Law"; requires school buses that transport students with special needs to be equipped with certain safety features.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3593 (Carry Over) 2022-03-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
A3593 (Carry Over) 2022-03-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
S57 (Same As) 2022-06-09 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A2027 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
S277 (Carry Over) 2020-06-22 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A3593 (Carry Over) 2022-03-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
S57 (Same As) 2022-06-09 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A2027 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
S277 (Carry Over) 2020-06-22 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2022/A3593 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2022/A4000/3593_I1.HTM |