NJ A3613 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S2172
Note: Carry Over of previous A4448
Note: Carry Over of previous A4448
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-05 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-05 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits State-sponsored travel to certain states without protections against discrimination based on sex, gender identity or expression, and affectional or sexual orientation.*
Title
Prohibits State-sponsored travel to certain states without protections against discrimination based on sex, gender identity or expression, and affectional or sexual orientation.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-05 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 54 N: 17 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 54 N: 17 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-05 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
2016-04-07 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (54-17-1) |
2016-04-04 | Assembly | Introduced, 1st Reading without Reference, 2nd Reading |
Same As/Similar To
A3613 (Carry Over) 2016-05-05 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
A439 (Same As) 2017-01-19 - Withdrawn from Consideration
A4448 (Carry Over) 2015-06-01 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
S2043 (Same As) 2016-05-05 - Reported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading
A439 (Same As) 2017-01-19 - Withdrawn from Consideration
A4448 (Carry Over) 2015-06-01 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
S2043 (Same As) 2016-05-05 - Reported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading