NJ A3618 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S1868
Note: Carry Foward to future A4095
Note: Carry Over of previous A4054
Note: Carry Over of previous S459
Note: Carry Foward to future A4095
Note: Carry Over of previous A4054
Note: Carry Over of previous S459
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 17 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-17 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 17 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-17 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows county sheriffs to issue firearms identification cards and permits to purchase handguns; authorizes county sheriffs to accept applications for permits to carry handguns.
Title
Allows county sheriffs to issue firearms identification cards and permits to purchase handguns; authorizes county sheriffs to accept applications for permits to carry handguns.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-17 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3618 (Carry Over) 2022-03-17 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
A3618 (Carry Over) 2022-03-17 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
S671 (Same As) 2022-01-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
A4054 (Carry Over) 2020-05-07 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
S459 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
A3618 (Carry Over) 2022-03-17 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
S671 (Same As) 2022-01-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
A4054 (Carry Over) 2020-05-07 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
S459 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2022/A3618 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2022/A4000/3618_I1.HTM |