NJ A3619 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 13 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-13 - Passed by the Assembly (73-3-4)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 13 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-13 - Passed by the Assembly (73-3-4)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires cable television, telecommunications, and utility service providers request alternate mode of communication from customers; requires that providers contact customers in event of service interruptions and emergencies.*
Title
Requires cable television, telecommunications, and utility service providers request alternate mode of communication from customers; requires that providers contact customers in event of service interruptions and emergencies.*
Sponsors
Sen. Joseph Cryan [D] | Rep. Angelica Jimenez [D] | Sen. Chris Brown [R] | Sen. Patrick Diegnan [D] |
Sen. John McKeon [D] | Rep. Grace Spencer [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-13 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (73-3-4) |
2014-01-06 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Cryan) |
2013-11-18 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2012-12-17 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee |