NJ A3646 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A4437
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on August 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-17 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on August 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-17 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires separate entrance for certain child care services located in public school facilities and clarifies licensure requirements and DCF enforcement authority for services.
Title
Requires separate entrance for certain child care services located in public school facilities and clarifies licensure requirements and DCF enforcement authority for services.
Sponsors
Rep. Carol Murphy [D] | Rep. Gabriela Mosquera [D] | Sen. Angela Mcknight [D] | Sen. Raj Mukherji [D] |
Rep. Mila Jasey [D] | Rep. Joann Downey [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-08-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 70 N: 3 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Assembly - Assembly Women and Children Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Assembly - Assembly Women and Children Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-17 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
2020-08-27 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (70-3-4) |
2020-08-24 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-03-16 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3646 (Carry Over) 2020-09-17 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee