NJ A3707 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on May 19 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-29 - Substituted by S1967/1749 (SCS)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 19 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-29 - Substituted by S1967/1749 (SCS)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes current and retired administrative law judges to solemnize marriages and civil unions.*
Title
Authorizes current and retired administrative law judges to solemnize marriages and civil unions.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-09-19 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-29 | Assembly | Substituted by S1967/1749 (SCS) |
2016-09-19 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2016-05-19 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1749 (Same As) 2016-05-05 - Combined with S1967 (SCS)
S1967 (Same As) 2016-11-14 - Approved P.L.2016, c.61.
S1967 (Same As) 2016-11-14 - Approved P.L.2016, c.61.