NJ A3721 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A669
Note: Carry Foward to future S3001
Note: Carry Over of previous A4441
Note: Carry Foward to future S3001
Note: Carry Over of previous A4441
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-25 - Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-25 - Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes prohibition or regulation of rental of certain space for accommodation of transient guests.*
Title
Authorizes prohibition or regulation of rental of certain space for accommodation of transient guests.*
Sponsors
Rep. Valerie Huttle [D] | Sen. Raj Mukherji [D] | Sen. Angela Mcknight [D] | Rep. Cleopatra Tucker [D] |
Rep. Patricia Jones [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-07 - Assembly - Assembly Tourism, Gaming and the Arts Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-25 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson) |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Sumter) |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Vainieri Huttle) |
2019-03-07 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2019-03-07 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Tourism, Gaming and the Arts Committee |
2018-03-22 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3721 (Carry Over) 2019-11-25 - Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson)
A3721 (Carry Over) 2019-11-25 - Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson)
S1734 (Same As) 2018-02-05 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
A4441 (Carry Over) 2017-02-27 - Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
A3721 (Carry Over) 2019-11-25 - Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson)
S1734 (Same As) 2018-02-05 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
A4441 (Carry Over) 2017-02-27 - Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee