NJ A3723 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S727
Note: Carry Over of previous A2499
Note: Carry Over of previous A2499
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-22 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Public Safety and Preparedness Committee
Pending: Assembly Public Safety and Preparedness Committee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-22 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Public Safety and Preparedness Committee
Pending: Assembly Public Safety and Preparedness Committee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires revocation of parole for assaulting or threatening law enforcement officers.
Title
Requires revocation of parole for assaulting or threatening law enforcement officers.
Sponsors
Rep. Carol Murphy [D] | Rep. Aura Dunn [R] | Rep. Al Barlas [R] | Rep. Jay Webber [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-22 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Public Safety and Preparedness Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S911 (Same As) 2024-01-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
S727 (Carry Over) 2022-01-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
A2499 (Carry Over) 2022-02-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
S727 (Carry Over) 2022-01-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
A2499 (Carry Over) 2022-02-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2024/A3723 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2024/A4000/3723_I1.HTM |