NJ A3729 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S1935
Note: Carry Over of previous A2525
Note: Carry Over of previous A2525
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-22 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-22 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
"Linnette Lebron's Law"; modifies procedures for marriage or civil union where a party is terminally ill.
Title
"Linnette Lebron's Law"; modifies procedures for marriage or civil union where a party is terminally ill.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-22 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1935 (Carry Over) 2022-03-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
A2525 (Carry Over) 2022-02-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
S77 (Same As) 2024-01-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
A2525 (Carry Over) 2022-02-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
S77 (Same As) 2024-01-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2024/A3729 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2024/A4000/3729_I1.HTM |