NJ A3749 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S3584
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-4)
Status: Passed on July 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-26 - Approved P.L.2018, c.70.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-4)
Status: Passed on July 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-26 - Approved P.L.2018, c.70.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Designates portion of Interstate Highway Route 195 in Township of Howell as "State Trooper Marc K. Castellano Memorial Highway."
Title
Designates portion of Interstate Highway Route 195 in Township of Howell as "State Trooper Marc K. Castellano Memorial Highway."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S470 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-26 | Senate | Approved P.L.2018, c.70. |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (37-0) |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Substituted for S470 |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2018-05-24 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (73-0-0) |
2018-05-10 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-04-05 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S470 (Same As) 2018-06-07 - Substituted by A3749 (1R)
S3584 (Carry Over) 2017-12-04 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee
S3584 (Carry Over) 2017-12-04 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee