NJ A3764 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on January 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-01-17 - Approved P.L.2013, c.271.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on January 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-01-17 - Approved P.L.2013, c.271.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Permits counties and municipalities to use snow removal reserve funds for clearance of debris following declaration of emergency by President or Governor.
Title
Permits counties and municipalities to use snow removal reserve funds for clearance of debris following declaration of emergency by President or Governor.
Sponsors
Rep. Ronald Dancer [R] | Rep. Upendra Chivukula [D] | Rep. Amy Handlin [R] | Rep. Gary Schaer [D] |
Rep. Craig Coughlin [D] | Sen. Jeff Van Drew [D] | Sen. Robert Gordon [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-09 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S3052 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-21 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-09 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S3052 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-21 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-17 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2013, c.271. |
2014-01-13 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (79-0-0) |
2014-01-09 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2014-01-09 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (39-0) |
2014-01-09 | Senate | Substituted for S3052 (1R) |
2013-12-12 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
2013-03-21 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (76-0-0) |
2013-03-14 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2013-02-07 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Homeland Security and State Preparedness Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3052 (Same As) 2014-01-09 - Substituted by A3764 (1R)