NJ A3772 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A224
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on January 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-31 - Approved P.L.2019, c.22.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on January 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-31 - Approved P.L.2019, c.22.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for licensing of pool and spa service contractors, and pool and spa builders and installers.
Title
Provides for licensing of pool and spa service contractors, and pool and spa builders and installers.
Sponsors
Rep. Wayne DeAngelo [D] | Rep. Annette Quijano [D] | Sen. James Beach [D] | Sen. Joseph Cryan [D] |
Rep. Daniel Benson [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-10-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Amend (Y: 61 N: 13 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S2091 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Enact Emergency Clause (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 11 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Regulated Professions Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S2091 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Enact Emergency Clause (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 11 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Regulated Professions Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-31 | Senate | Approved P.L.2019, c.22. |
2018-12-17 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (30-3) |
2018-12-03 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2018-10-29 | Assembly | Concur by Assembly Amendments (61-13-2) (As Amended 9/27/18) |
2018-09-27 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson) |
2018-07-30 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2018-07-26 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (27-3) |
2018-07-26 | Senate | Emergency Resolution (30-0) (Beach) |
2018-07-26 | Senate | Senate Amendment (26-0) (Beach) |
2018-07-26 | Senate | Substituted for S2091 |
2018-06-29 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2018-06-30 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (58-11-3) |
2018-06-11 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-04-05 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Regulated Professions Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2091 (Same As) 2018-07-26 - Substituted by A3772 (1R)
A224 (Carry Over) 2018-01-08 - Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (53-15-1)
A224 (Carry Over) 2018-01-08 - Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (53-15-1)