NJ A3788 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 20-4)
Status: Passed on August 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-08 - Approved P.L.2013, c.116.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 20-4)
Status: Passed on August 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-08 - Approved P.L.2013, c.116.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Codifies regulation exempting firearms records from State's open public records law. *
Title
Codifies regulation exempting firearms records from State's open public records law. *
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-30 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S2552 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-13 - Senate - Senate Amend (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 19 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-13 - Senate - Senate Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-21 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-30 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S2552 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-13 - Senate - Senate Amend (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 19 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-13 - Senate - Senate Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-21 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-08 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2013, c.116. |
2013-06-24 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (78-0-0) |
2013-06-06 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (40-0) |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Substituted for S2552 (2R) |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Senate Amendment (21-0) (Weinberg) |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Transferred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
2013-02-21 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (77-0-0) |
2013-02-14 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2013-02-07 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2552 (Same As) 2013-05-30 - Substituted by A3788 (2R)