NJ A3792 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2868
Note: Carry Foward to future S668
Note: Carry Foward to future S668
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on May 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-12-07 - Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Wimberly)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-12-07 - Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Wimberly)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Increases Medicaid reimbursement for in-person partial care and intensive outpatient behavioral health and substance use disorder treatment services, and associated transportation services, for adults.
Title
Increases Medicaid reimbursement for in-person partial care and intensive outpatient behavioral health and substance use disorder treatment services, and associated transportation services, for adults.
Sponsors
Rep. Daniel Benson [D] | Rep. Anthony Verrelli [D] | Rep. Louis Greenwald [D] | Rep. Reginald Atkins [D] |
Rep. Claire Swift [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-06-22 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-12-08 - Assembly - Assembly Human Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-10-13 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-12-08 - Assembly - Assembly Human Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-10-13 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-07 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Wimberly) |
2023-06-22 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2023-06-22 | Assembly | Recommitted to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2022-12-08 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2022-10-13 | Assembly | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee |
2022-05-02 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3792 (Carry Over) 2023-12-07 - Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Wimberly)
A3792 (Carry Over) 2023-12-07 - Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Wimberly)
S1895 (Same As) 2023-12-07 - Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Wimberly)
A3792 (Carry Over) 2023-12-07 - Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Wimberly)
S1895 (Same As) 2023-12-07 - Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Wimberly)