NJ A3798 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-4)
Status: Introduced on May 23 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Substituted by S211 (SCS/1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 23 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Substituted by S211 (SCS/1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes use of school bus monitoring systems.
Title
Authorizes use of school bus monitoring systems.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | Assembly | Substituted by S211 (SCS/1R) |
2017-06-01 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2017-05-18 | Assembly | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2016-05-23 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S211 (Same As) 2018-01-08 - Passed by the Assembly (61-3-6)