NJ A3805 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on October 9 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-12-03 - Substituted by S2453 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 9 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-12-03 - Substituted by S2453 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires earlier mandatory polling hours for school elections; requires discretionary additional polling hours be consistent with current primary and general elections.*
Title
Requires earlier mandatory polling hours for school elections; requires discretionary additional polling hours be consistent with current primary and general elections.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-03 | Assembly | Substituted by S2453 (1R) |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2014-10-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2453 (Same As) 2016-01-11 - Approved P.L.2015, c.181.