NJ A3806 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A3202
Note: Carry Foward to future S2311
Note: Carry Over of previous A1198
Note: Carry Over of previous S1096
Note: Carry Foward to future S2311
Note: Carry Over of previous A1198
Note: Carry Over of previous S1096
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Community Development and Affairs Committee
Pending: Assembly Community Development and Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Community Development and Affairs Committee
Pending: Assembly Community Development and Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires inspection for pest infestation prior to certain demolition.
Title
Requires inspection for pest infestation prior to certain demolition.
Sponsors
Sen. Britnee Timberlake [D] | Rep. Benjie Wimberly [D] | Rep. Mila Jasey [D] | Rep. William Spearman [D] |
Rep. Clinton Calabrese [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Community Development and Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3806 (Carry Over) 2020-03-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Community Development and Affairs Committee
A3806 (Carry Over) 2020-03-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Community Development and Affairs Committee
S1470 (Same As) 2020-02-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
A1198 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee
S1096 (Carry Over) 2018-01-25 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A3806 (Carry Over) 2020-03-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Community Development and Affairs Committee
S1470 (Same As) 2020-02-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
A1198 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee
S1096 (Carry Over) 2018-01-25 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/A3806 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/A4000/3806_I1.HTM |