NJ A3810 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-17 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-17 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Concerns employer contribution reports.
Title
Concerns employer contribution reports.
Sponsors
Rep. Wayne DeAngelo [D] | Rep. Daniel Benson [D] | Sen. Fred Madden [D] | Sen. Paul Sarlo [D] |
Sen. Sandra Cunningham [D] | Sen. Jeff Van Drew [D] | Sen. Steven Oroho [R] | Sen. Linda Greenstein [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-17 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2013-06-13 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Budget Committee |
2013-02-11 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2629 (Same As) 2013-03-04 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2012/A3810 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2012/A4000/3810_I1.HTM |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2012/A4000/3810_R1.HTM |