NJ A3810 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Introduced on May 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-10-27 - Substituted by S2396 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-10-27 - Substituted by S2396 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for oversight and improvement of administration of unemployment compensation.
Title
Provides for oversight and improvement of administration of unemployment compensation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-10-17 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Oversight, Reform and Federal Relations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Oversight, Reform and Federal Relations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-27 | Assembly | Substituted by S2396 (1R) |
2022-10-17 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Labor Committee |
2022-05-02 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Oversight, Reform and Federal Relations Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2396 (Same As) 2023-05-08 - Approved P.L.2023, c.42.