NJ A3815 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-7)
Status: Passed on December 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-26 - Approved P.L.2014, c.84.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-7)
Status: Passed on December 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-26 - Approved P.L.2014, c.84.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Extends for one year expiration date of certain permits pursuant to "Permit Extension Act of 2008." *
Title
Extends for one year expiration date of certain permits pursuant to "Permit Extension Act of 2008." *
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-12-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S2551 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 66 N: 1 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 31 N: 5 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 31 N: 5 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-18 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S2551 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-18 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 66 N: 1 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-15 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 66 N: 1 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 31 N: 5 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 31 N: 5 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-18 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S2551 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-18 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 66 N: 1 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-15 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-26 | Senate | Approved P.L.2014, c.84. |
2014-12-18 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (31-5) |
2014-12-18 | Senate | Substituted for S2551 (1R) |
2014-12-18 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2014-12-18 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (66-1-8) |
2014-12-15 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2014-12-15 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2014-10-16 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2551 (Same As) 2014-12-18 - Substituted by A3815 (1R)