NJ A3819 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S429
Note: Carry Over of previous A2383
Note: Carry Over of previous A2383
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Regulated Professions Committee
Pending: Assembly Regulated Professions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Regulated Professions Committee
Pending: Assembly Regulated Professions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Regulates audits of pharmacies.
Title
Regulates audits of pharmacies.
Sponsors
Rep. Gary Schaer [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Regulated Professions Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S840 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
S429 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
A2383 (Carry Over) 2018-02-01 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Regulated Professions Committee
S429 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
A2383 (Carry Over) 2018-02-01 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Regulated Professions Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/A3819 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/A4000/3819_I1.HTM |