NJ A3867 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S353
Note: Carry Over of previous A3657
Note: Carry Over of previous A3657
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-27 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Oversight, Reform and Federal Relations Committee
Pending: Assembly Oversight, Reform and Federal Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-27 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Oversight, Reform and Federal Relations Committee
Pending: Assembly Oversight, Reform and Federal Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Legalizes growing or possessing up to six marijuana plants for personal recreational use, and up to 10 plants for personal medical use, by persons aged 21 or older.
Title
Legalizes growing or possessing up to six marijuana plants for personal recreational use, and up to 10 plants for personal medical use, by persons aged 21 or older.
Sponsors
Rep. Verlina Reynolds-Jackson [D] | Rep. Benjie Wimberly [D] | Rep. Annette Quijano [D] | Rep. Michael Venezia [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-27 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Oversight, Reform and Federal Relations Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1985 (Same As) 2024-01-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
S353 (Carry Over) 2022-01-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
A3657 (Carry Over) 2022-03-17 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
S353 (Carry Over) 2022-01-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
A3657 (Carry Over) 2022-03-17 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2024/A3867 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2024/A4000/3867_I1.HTM |