NJ A3874 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S2747
Note: Carry Over of previous A4164
Note: Carry Over of previous A4164
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-27 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-27 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes fringe benefit rate for State colleges and universities.
Title
Establishes fringe benefit rate for State colleges and universities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-27 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1603 (Same As) 2024-01-25 - Transferred to Senate Higher Education Committee
S2747 (Carry Over) 2023-06-30 - Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
A4164 (Carry Over) 2023-06-22 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
S2747 (Carry Over) 2023-06-30 - Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
A4164 (Carry Over) 2023-06-22 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2024/A3874 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2024/A4000/3874_I1.HTM |
Supplement | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2024/A4000/3874_E1.PDF |