NJ A3874 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-24 - Substituted by S2620
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-24 - Substituted by S2620
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revises eligibility criteria for shore protection funding.
Title
Revises eligibility criteria for shore protection funding.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-24 | Assembly | Substituted by S2620 |
2013-06-10 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2013-02-26 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2620 (Same As) 2013-08-19 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Senate
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2012/A3874 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2012/A4000/3874_I1.HTM |