NJ A3883 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S3421
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Withdrawn from Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Withdrawn from Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits sale of cats, dogs, or rabbit by pet shops; prohibits certain transactions between animal shelters, pounds, animal rescue organizations, and animal breeders or brokers; repeals "Pet Purchase Protection Act."
Title
Prohibits sale of cats, dogs, or rabbit by pet shops; prohibits certain transactions between animal shelters, pounds, animal rescue organizations, and animal breeders or brokers; repeals "Pet Purchase Protection Act."
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-08 | Assembly | Withdrawn from Consideration |
2024-02-27 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce, Economic Development and Agriculture Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S297 (Same As) 2024-01-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
S3421 (Carry Over) 2023-11-30 - Withdrawn from Consideration
S3421 (Carry Over) 2023-11-30 - Withdrawn from Consideration
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2024/A3883 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2024/A4000/3883_I1.HTM |