NJ A3901 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S139
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on June 16 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-27 - Substituted by S166
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 16 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-27 - Substituted by S166
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes Hunterdon-Somerset Flood Advisory Task Force.
Title
Establishes Hunterdon-Somerset Flood Advisory Task Force.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-27 | Assembly | Substituted by S166 |
2016-06-20 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S166 (Same As) 2016-08-31 - Approved P.L.2016, c.34.
S139 (Carry Over) 2014-06-12 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee
S139 (Carry Over) 2014-06-12 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee