NJ A3919 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-01 - Approved P.L.2020, c.53.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-01 - Approved P.L.2020, c.53.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Extends certain permits, approvals, and deadlines during COVID-19 emergency.
Title
Extends certain permits, approvals, and deadlines during COVID-19 emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S2346 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-07 - Assembly - Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S2346 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-07 - Assembly - Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-01 | Senate | Approved P.L.2020, c.53. |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (37-0) |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading - Concur. w/Gov's Recom. |
2020-06-29 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (73-0-0) |
2020-06-25 | Assembly | 2nd Reading in the Assembly on Concur. w/Gov.'s Recommend. |
2020-06-25 | Assembly | First Reading/Governor Recommendations Only |
2020-06-25 | Assembly | Conditional Veto, Received in the Assembly |
2020-05-14 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (36-0) |
2020-05-14 | Senate | Substituted for S2346 (SCS) |
2020-05-14 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2020-05-14 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (79-0-0) |
2020-05-11 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-05-11 | Assembly | Recommitted to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2020-05-07 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-05-01 | Assembly | Recommitted to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee |
2020-04-09 | Assembly | Introduced, 1st Reading without Reference, 2nd Reading |
Same As/Similar To
S2346 (Same As) 2020-05-14 - Substituted by A3919 (1R)