NJ A3945 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S2940
Note: Carry Over of previous A2160
Note: Carry Over of previous A2160
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-04 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-04 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for law enforcement officer benefits for certain public employees enrolled in PERS; prohibits hiring by State or county of public employees after age 35 in positions eligible for PFRS.
Title
Provides for law enforcement officer benefits for certain public employees enrolled in PERS; prohibits hiring by State or county of public employees after age 35 in positions eligible for PFRS.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-04 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2539 (Same As) 2024-02-08 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
S2940 (Carry Over) 2022-06-27 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
A2160 (Carry Over) 2022-02-07 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
S2940 (Carry Over) 2022-06-27 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
A2160 (Carry Over) 2022-02-07 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2024/A3945 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2024/A4000/3945_I1.HTM |