NJ A3988 | 2010-2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 9 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-29 - Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Quijano)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 9 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-29 - Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Quijano)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes mutual aid assistance request protocols for 9-1-1 ambulance dispatchers.
Title
Establishes mutual aid assistance request protocols for 9-1-1 ambulance dispatchers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-29 | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Quijano) | |
2011-06-16 | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading | |
2011-05-09 | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Homeland Security and State Preparedness Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1081 (Same As) 2010-02-04 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2010/A3988 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2010/A4000/3988_I1.HTM |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2010/A4000/3988_R1.HTM |