NJ A3989 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-05-20 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-05-20 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes a teacher leader endorsement to the instructional certificate.
Title
Authorizes a teacher leader endorsement to the instructional certificate.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-20 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee |
2013-05-20 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (74-2-1) |
2013-05-13 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2013-04-04 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2730 (Same As) 2013-04-29 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee