NJ A4010 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S759
Note: Carry Over of previous S2192
Note: Carry Over of previous A662
Note: Carry Over of previous S2192
Note: Carry Over of previous A662
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 16 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
Pending: Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 16 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
Pending: Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires DOT to inspect traffic signs and establish public awareness campaign concerning traffic signs in need of maintenance.
Title
Requires DOT to inspect traffic signs and establish public awareness campaign concerning traffic signs in need of maintenance.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-16 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4010 (Carry Over) 2022-05-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
S410 (Same As) 2022-01-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee
S2192 (Carry Over) 2020-03-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee
A662 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
S410 (Same As) 2022-01-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee
S2192 (Carry Over) 2020-03-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee
A662 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2022/A4010 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2022/A4500/4010_I1.HTM |